CA AB1593 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 563, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 563, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18510 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1593 Ridley-Thomas By Allen (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1593 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1593 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 563, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2526.). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1993.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |