CA AB1587 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19431 of, and to add Section 19448 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
California Horse Racing Board: public records: criminal offender record information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1587 G.O. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1587 G.O. (Frazier) By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1587 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1587 G.O. (Frazier) By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1587 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 536, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2749.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2293.). |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1657.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19448 | New Code | See Bill Text |