CA AB1582 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 87315 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: Conflict of Interest
Sponsors
Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. Matthew Harper [R] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and HIGHER ED. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 87315 | New Code | See Bill Text |