CA AB1582 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34191.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Redevelopment: successor agencies: postcompliance provisions: loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1582 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1582 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 4940.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR. |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34191.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |