CA AB1571 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 99350) to Part 65 of Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: Free Speech on Campus Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 99350 | New Code | See Bill Text |