CA AB1560 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18901.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
CalFresh: categorical eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1560 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1560 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5105.) | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2012-01-31 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | |
2012-01-30 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18901.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |