CA AB1559 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 28240 and 33300 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1559 PORTANTINO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1559 Portantino By Correa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1559 PORTANTINO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1559 Portantino By Correa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1559 PORTANTINO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6298.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4702.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4674.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). | |
2012-03-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-16 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-01-31 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | |
2012-01-30 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 25617 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26390 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26537 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26595 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27138 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27755 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27823 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27827 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27963 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27965 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27966 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31845 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 33300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |