CA AB1550 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 15100.3, 15267, and 15302 to the Education Code, relating to school finance.
Title
School finance: school bonds: small school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1550 LIMÓN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1550 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1550 LIMÓN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1550 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1550 LIMÓN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3012.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2350.). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 15100.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 15151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 15267 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 15302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 42131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |