CA AB1542 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-01 - Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 6984.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Jones.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-01 - Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 6984.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Jones.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 24300) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical homes, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medical homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1542 JONES Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1542 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1542 Jones Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1542 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1542 HEALTH Assembly Third Reading By JONES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1542 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1542 Jones Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1542 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1542 HEALTH Assembly Third Reading By JONES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-01 | Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 6984.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Jones. | |
2010-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2010-08-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5101.) | |
2010-08-30 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5028.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Alquist. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5028.) | |
2010-08-27 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-12 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-08-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-10 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 9). | |
2010-08-05 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-08-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-07-02 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-07-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1462.) | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 12). | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-05 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time. To print. |