CA AB1541 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1798.81.5 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: personal information.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1541 Committee On P. & C.P. (Gatto) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1541 P.& C.P. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1541 P.& C.P. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1618.). |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1446.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 26. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22580 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22581 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22584 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.81.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |