CA AB1536 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 18937, 18938, and 18939 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 10.3 (commencing with Section 18937) of Part 6 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Cash Assistance Program for Aged, Blind, and Disabled Immigrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1536 Juan Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1536 Juan Carrillo et al. By Durazo (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1536 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1536 Juan Carrillo et al. By Durazo (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1536 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 7. Page 3472.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2702.). |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 2045.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18937 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18938 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18939 | Amended Code | Citation Text |