CA AB1529 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 830, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 830, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26122 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Cannabis vaporizing cartridges: universal symbol.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1529 Low Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Business and Professions] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1529 Low By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1529 Low Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Business and Professions] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1529 Low By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1529 Low Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 830, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3372.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 10). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 5). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2967.) |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2289.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1080.) |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26122 | New Code | See Bill Text |