CA AB1520 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6254.16 of the Government Code, relating to public records.
Title
Public Records.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1520 Mark Stone By Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1520 Mark Stone By Wieckowski (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - AB 1520 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1520 Mark Stone By Wieckowski (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - AB 1520 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 20. Page 5165.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wieckowski. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5165.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 973.) |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 14). |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 10. |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6254.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |