CA AB1518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18895.2, 18897.6, and 18897.73 of, and to add Section 18897.74 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to athletes.
Title
Student athletes: contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1518 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1518 Chu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1518 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1518 Chu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1518 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2748.). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2182.). |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 3). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., ED. and JUD. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1515.) |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 18895.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 18897.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 18897.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 18897.74 | New Code | See Bill Text |