CA AB1517 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25102, 25104, 25110, 25501, 25503, and 25608 of, and to add Section 25113.1 to, the Corporations Code, relating to securities.
Title
Securities transactions: qualifications by permit: liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 25102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25113.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 25501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25608 | Amended Code | Citation Text |