CA AB1516 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23010, 51182, and 51186 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 4124.5, 4291, 4740, and 4741 of, to add Sections 4291.8 and 4295.6 to, and to add and repeal Sections 4291.5, 4291.6, and 4291.7 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire prevention: wildfire risk: defensible space and fuels reduction management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1516 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1516 Friedman et al. By Dodd (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Result (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1516 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21 Stricken from file.
2019-10-13 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3390.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2782.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-07SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1895.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback