CA AB1515 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 739.3, 922.41 1729.2, 1861.02, 1861.025, 10111.2, 10127.13, 10232.3, 10235.35, 12418.4, and 12921 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 510, 742.34, 790.034, 1725.5, 1764.1, 10169, 10192.18, and 12820 of, and to repeal Section 10233.9 of, the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 1299.04 of the Penal Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1515 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1515 Committee On INS. (Roth) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 1515 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-01AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-08-24AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2564.).
2015-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2119.).
2015-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-08-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2015-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
2015-05-07SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2015-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1110.)
2015-04-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
2015-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2015-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2015-03-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
2015-03-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10111.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10127.13Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10169Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10192.18Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10232.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10233.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10233.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10235.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code12418.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code12820Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code12921Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1725.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1729.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1764.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1861.02Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1861.025Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code481Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code510Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code739.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code742.34Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code790.034Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code922.41Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1299.04Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1515&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20150305_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20150406_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20150420_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20150519_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20150826_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20150928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20150408_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20150415_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20150423_1001AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20150708_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20150820_1124AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20150824_1255PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback