CA AB1513 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8899.70, 8899.72, 15470, 15471, 15473, 15474, 15475, 16480.45, and 20194.5 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 10089.6, 10089.7, and 11797 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 311, 326.1, 336, 371, 374, 379.5, 384, 394.25, 399.20, 451.1, 701.1, 714, 715, 740.3, 785, 850, 850.1, 854.2, 895, 1701.8, 1822, 2774.6, 2840.2, 2854, 3280, 3281, 3282, 3283, 3288, 3289, 3291, 3292, 3295, 3296, 3297, 8386.3, 8389, and 9607 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 80524, 80544, and 80550 of, to amend and renumber Sections 80502 and 80503 of, and to repeal Section 80500 of, the Water Code, and to amend Sections 1, 2, and 25 of Chapter 79 of the Statutes of 2019, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1513 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1513 Holden By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB1513 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1513 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-10SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 10)
2019-09-09SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-09-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-06SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2019-08-26SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2019-08-26AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2019-08-26AssemblyWithdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
2019-08-19SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1638.)
2019-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15470Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15471Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15473Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15474Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15475Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16480.45Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20194.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8899.70Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8899.72Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10089.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10089.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code11797Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code1701.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code1822Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2774.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2840.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2854Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code311Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code326.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3280Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3281Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3282Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3283Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3288Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3289Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3291Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3292Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3295Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3296Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code3297Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code336Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code371Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code374Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code379.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code384Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code394.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code399.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code399.20Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code451.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code701.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code714Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code715Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code740.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code773Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code785Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8389Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code850Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code850.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code854.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code895Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code9607Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code80500Repealed CodeCitation Text
Water Code80524Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code80544Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code80550Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback