CA AB1511 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 676.8, 678, 1656.1, 1656.2, 1668, 1668.5, 1871.2, 10103.7, 10168.25, 10271, 10271.1, 10273.6, 10295, 11797, 12921.2, 12928.6, 14050, 14052, 14062, and 15040 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 1210 of, and to add Section 1871.10 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1511 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent AB1511 INS (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1511 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent AB1511 INS (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1511 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2966.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 8). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and PUB. S. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1472.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10103.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10168.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10271.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10273.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 11797 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 12921.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 12928.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 14050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 14052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 14062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 15040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1656.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1656.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1668 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1668.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1871.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 676.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 678 | Amended Code | Citation Text |