CA AB1506 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 1954.50) of Title 5 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential rent control: Costa-Hawkins Rental Housing Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2018-01-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-02-21AssemblyIntroduced measure version corrected.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1954.50Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback