CA AB1505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 47604.5, 47605, 47605.6, 47607, and 47607.3 of, to add Sections 47605.9 and 47612.7 to, and to repeal Sections 47605.8 and 47607.5 of, the Education Code, relating to charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter schools: petitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1505 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 19. Page 1833.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback