CA AB1492 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2802.2 to, and to add Part 4.6 (commencing with Section 1460) to Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: Telecommuting Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1492 Boerner Horvath Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-07-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1405.) |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2802.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |