CA AB1485 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65913.4 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing development: streamlining.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1485 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1485 Wicks By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1485 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1485 Wicks By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1485 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 3. Page 3546.). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2900.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1571.) |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |