CA AB1483 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65940.1 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 50452 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing data: collection and reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1483 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1483 Grayson et al. By Wiener (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1483 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1483 Grayson et al. By Wiener (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1483 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3495.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2863.). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 10) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1894.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65940.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |