CA AB1454 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation projects: lease agreements.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 21 corrected. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 143 | Amended Code | Citation Text |