CA AB1438 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116760.20, 116760.40, and 116761.23 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1438 CONWAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent #20 AB1438 Conway By Aanestad (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1438 CONWAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent #20 AB1438 Conway By Aanestad (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1438 CONWAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-11 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3353.) | |
2009-09-10 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-09-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.) | |
2009-09-08 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-09-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11)) | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2009-06-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1855.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P. & W. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |