CA AB1437 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.6 (commencing with Section 19060) to Part 3 of Division 9 of the Food and Agriculture Code, relating to medically important antimicrobials.
Title
Medically important antimicrobials: livestock and poultry.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] |
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |