CA AB1418 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25232 to the Public Resources Code, and to add Sections 740.18 and 9509 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation electrification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation electrification: electric school buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and U. & E.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25232New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code740.18New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code9509New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback