CA AB141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 15210) to Part 6 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to county reimbursement.
Title
County reimbursement: Joseph James DeAngelo, Jr. costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2018-12-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 12. |
2018-12-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15210 | New Code | See Bill Text |