CA AB141 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44259 of the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: beginning teacher induction programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 141 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB141 Bonilla By Wolk (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 141 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB141 Bonilla By Wolk (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 141 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2015-10-10 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 12. Page 3051.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2637.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1861.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44279.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44279.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |