CA AB1407 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 871.5 and 873 of, to add Sections 875.5 and 1001.7 to, to repeal Sections 871.7, 879, 879.5, 880, 882, and 883 of, and to repeal and add Sections 872, 874, 875, 876, 877, and 878 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public communications.
Title
Public utilities: voice communications service: lifeline program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1407 U.& C. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1407 U.& C. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 8). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1579.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 13. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1001.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 871.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 871.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 872 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 873 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 874 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 875.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 876 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 877 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 878 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 879 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 879.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 880 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 882 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 883 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |