CA AB1395 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38562.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
The California Climate Crisis Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1395 Muratsuchi et al. By Laird Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1395 Muratsuchi et al. By Laird (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1395 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1395 Muratsuchi et al. By Laird (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1395 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2634.) |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 14. Noes 12. Page 2633.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 21. Page 1904.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 28). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38562.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |