CA AB1370 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 68052.1 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: student residency.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1370 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1882.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 68052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 68052.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 68052.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |