CA AB1360 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5110, 5120, 5125, and 5260 of, and to add Section 5116 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: electronic voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1360 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1360 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 1325.) |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 5117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 5120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |