CA AB1337 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 111 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to the Fish and Game Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fish and Game Commission: meetings and hearings: live broadcast.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1337 Patterson et al. By Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1337 PATTERSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15 Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
2018-05-15 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-05-14 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-04-30AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3862.).
2018-04-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-09SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-16SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1394.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code111New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback