CA AB1335 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 111224) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Sugar-sweetened beverages: safety warnings.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1335 KALRA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1335 KALRA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1858.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on HEALTH) |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1117.) |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111224 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1418 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |