CA AB1332 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50022.4 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government ordinances.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 50022.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |