CA AB1332 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8880.325 of the Government Code, relating to the California State Lottery, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California State Lottery: assignment of prize payments.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1332 HAGMAN Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1332 Hagman Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1332 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1332 Hagman Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1332 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2787.). |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1981.). |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1470.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16722 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8880.325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |