CA AB1331 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5401 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: Statewide Director of Crisis Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1331 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1331 Irwin By Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1331 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1331 Irwin By Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1331 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-07 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2835.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2337.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1788.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5401 | New Code | See Bill Text |