CA AB1324 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 132301, 132322, 180201, 180206, and 180207 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: local transportation authorities: transactions and use taxes.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1324 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading Amend By GLORIA Set #1 (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 3851.) |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (January 10). |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65087 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 132301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 132322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 180201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 180206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 180207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |