CA AB1323 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3460.5 to the Penal Code, relating to postrelease community supervision.
Title
Postrelease community supervision.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1323 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1323 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-22 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-06-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-09 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1280.) | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 186.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3460.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |