CA AB1314 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8594.13 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency notification: Feather Alert: endangered indigenous people.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1314 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1314 Ramos et al. By Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1314 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1314 Ramos et al. By Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1314 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5126.). |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1339.) |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8594.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |