CA AB1312 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 71200, 71204.3, 71204.7, 71205, 71205.3, 71206, and 71207 of, and to repeal Sections 71204.2 and 71210.5 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to ballast water management.
Title
Ballast water management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1312 O'Donnell By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1312 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1312 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2148.). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1350.) |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and TRANS. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71204.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71204.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71204.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71204.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71205.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71210.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |