CA AB1307 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 125001 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to newborn screening, and making an appropriation thereof.
Title
Newborn genetic screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1307 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1307 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). | |
2009-07-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 1751.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 20). | |
2009-05-06 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |