CA AB1304 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8899.50, 65583, and 65583.2 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Affirmatively further fair housing: housing element: inventory of land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1304 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1304 Santiago et al. By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1304 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1304 Santiago et al. By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1304 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 3083.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2582.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 1430.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 5). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65583.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8899.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |