CA AB1303 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 541, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 38134 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School facilities: Civic Center Act: direct costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1303 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB1303 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1303 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 541, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3478.).
2019-09-11AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2019-08-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
2019-08-19SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2079.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-03AssemblyMeasure version as amended on April 1 corrected.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code33457New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code38134Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53070Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53071Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53072Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53073Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53075Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53076Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53076.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code53076.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53076.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88821Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88822Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88823Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88825Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88826Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88827Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code88828Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code88829Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code88830Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code88831Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code88832Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code88833Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback