CA AB1271 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54221, 54222, 54222.5, 54223, 54224, 54225, 54227, and 54230.5 of the Government Code, relating to surplus land.
Title
Surplus land.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 14). |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54222.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54224 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54230.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |