CA AB1270 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42705.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Natural gas plants: methane monitoring systems and reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 42705.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |