CA AB1243 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16321, 16773, and 16965.1 of, and to repeal Section 16965 of, the Government Code, to add Section 21080.38 to the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 99315 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 13152 of, and to add Sections 6051.9 and 6201.9 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 183.1, 2032, 2034, and 2103 of, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 2040) to Division 3 of, the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 9400.1 and 42205 of, and to repeal Section 9400.4 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Traffic Relief and Road Improvement Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16773 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16965 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16965.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 13152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6051.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6201.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 183.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1243 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1243 |