CA AB1239 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 380.4 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: demand response resources and programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 380.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |